This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 04/02/2021 at 17:30:02 (UTC).

TREA CARRINGTON PARK LLC D/B/A CARRINGTON PARK APARTMENTS vs. NICCI SAUNDERS

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 TREA CARRINGTON PARK LLC D/B/A CARRINGTON PARK APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NICCI SAUNDERS. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0181

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TREA CARRINGTON PARK LLC D/B/A CARRINGTON PARK APARTMENTS

Patler Sims Martinez Pllc, 8115 Preston Rd # 600

Dallas, TX 75225

Defendant

SAUNDERS, NICCI

Plano, TX 75093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerry L Carlton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($175.00); Payor: TREA CARRINGTON PARK LLC D/B/A CARRINGTON PARK APARTMENTS; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-02715-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($10.00); Payor: TREA CARRINGTON PARK LLC D/B/A CARRINGTON PARK APARTMENTS; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-02703-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $175.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Comments: PLACED IN CON4 BOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution Requested and Paid For; Comments: PIF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: SAUNDERS, NICCI Type: WRIT OF POSSESSION -EVICTION; Origin: Precinct 4; Paper No: C4-21-000905; Location: PCT 4 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Comments: Mailed / emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: TREA CARRINGTON PARK LLC D/B/A CARRINGTON PARK APARTMENTS; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-01732-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Eviction Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: SAUNDERS, NICCI Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 4; Paper No: C4-21-000588; Location: PCT 4 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerry L. Carlton