This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/30/2020 at 00:50:02 (UTC).

Trails at Creekside vs. Rose Mitchell

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Trails at Creekside filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rose Mitchell. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0968

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trails at Creekside

1300 N. Custer Rd.

Allen, TX 75013

Defendant

Mitchell, Rose

Allen, TX 75013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: MLG PF Trails at Creekside, 19000 W. Bluemound Rd. Brookfield, WI 53045; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03925-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Comments: APPEAL BOND - $1351

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Trails at Creekside; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02980-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trails at Creekside is a litigant