This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/08/2019 at 16:13:59 (UTC).

Trails at Creekside vs. Mahmoud Abuahmed,Suhair Aljallad

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Trails at Creekside filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mahmoud Abuahmed,Suhair Aljallad. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0980

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trails at Creekside

1300 N Custer Rd

Allen, TX 75013

Defendants

Abuahmed, Mahmoud

Allen, TX 75013

Aljallad, Suhair

Allen, TX 75013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Citation Served; Comments: Mahmoud Abuahmed by serving Suhair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Citation Served; Comments: Suhair Aljallad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: Trails at Creekside; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02983-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $196.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Aljallad, Suhair Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 3-1; Paper No: C3-19-003490; Location: PCT 3 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Abuahmed, Mahmoud Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 3-1; Paper No: C3-19-003489; Location: PCT 3 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trails at Creekside is a litigant