This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/22/2020 at 00:08:09 (UTC).

Trails at Creekside vs. Anthony Gadson,Sharrell Gadson

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Trails at Creekside filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Anthony Gadson,Sharrell Gadson. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0979

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trails at Creekside

1300 N Custer Rd

Allen, TX 75013

Defendants

Gadson, Anthony

Allen, TX 75013

Gadson, Sharrell

Allen, TX 75013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: MLG PF Trails at Creekside; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03924-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Comments: APPEAL BOND - $1482

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served; Comments: Sharrell Gadson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served; Comments: Anthony Gadson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $196.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: Trails at Creekside; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02983-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trails at Creekside is a litigant