This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 06:29:40 (UTC).

Tiffany Budd vs. CWS Community Management, LLC,CWS Capital Partners, LLC,CWS Apartment Homes, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Tiffany Budd filed an Other lawsuit against CWS Community Management, LLC,CWS Capital Partners, LLC,CWS Apartment Homes, LLC. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Willis, Jill and Willis, Jill Renfro. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Willis, Jill

Willis, Jill Renfro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Budd, Tiffany

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendants

CWS Capital Partners, LLC

Preston Commons West, 8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

CWS Community Management, LLC

Preston Commons West, 8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

CWS Apartment Homes, LLC

Preston Commons West, 8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew R Scott

Defendant Attorneys

Michael D. Mitchell

John M. Barcus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketJury Trial; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed; Comments: 6 hours/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketFormal Pretrial Conference; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend*Proposed order in hold queue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Copy of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketMotion; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMotion to Quash; Comments: Defendant's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notices of Intent to Take Depositions of Nick Dyer and Linda Liles

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - CWS Community Management LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $5.00, Payments: $5.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Budd, Tiffany; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02708-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $5.00, Payments: $5.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $5.00, Payments: $5.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($346.00); Payor: Budd, Tiffany; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02229-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $5.00, Payments: $5.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $346.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketJury Fee Paid $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00

    Read MoreRead Less