Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 01/15/2021 at 19:24:45 (UTC).

THURMAN WOODLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC dba WOODLANDS OF PLANO vs.ARBRA ECHOLS, Jr.,NNENNA ECHOLS

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 THURMAN WOODLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC dba WOODLANDS OF PLANO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARBRA ECHOLS, Jr ,NNENNA ECHOLS. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0629

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THURMAN WOODLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC dba WOODLANDS OF PLANO

6300 La Calma Dr, Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

ECHOLS, NNENNA NWANNEDIYA

Plano, TX 75074

ECHOLS, ARBRA LEWIS, Jr.

1360 S. Rigsbee Dr., Apt B

Plano, TX 75074

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketAbatement (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation Served; Comments: Served; Arbra Echols , Nnenna Echols

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Hearing; Comments: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued for Eviction (Forcible Detainer); Comments: WITH ZOOM INFO AND CDC DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: THURMAN WOODLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC dba WOODLANDS OF PLANO; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-0002719-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $196.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketVerification of Compliance With Cares Act; Comments: WITH CDC DECLARATION; FILED WITH SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: THURMAN WOODLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC dba WOODLANDS OF PLANO VS ECHOLS AND ECHOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Woodlands Of Plano Apartments is a litigant