This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 09/21/2020 at 06:38:43 (UTC).

Thomas A. Oyebisi vs. Friday E. Ododo & Ojor Construction, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Thomas A Oyebisi filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Friday E Ododo Ojor Construction, LLC. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Tucker, Angela and Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Tucker, Angela

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oyebisi, Thomas A.

Dallas, TX 75243

Excelle Financial Services

Kafor Law Firm, Pllc, 8330 Lbj Freeway, Ste. B305

Dallas, TX 75243

Defendants

Ododo, Friday E

Katy, TX 77491

Ojor Construction, LLC

Heston Law Firm Pllc, Post Office Box 6049

Katy, TX 77491

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yvonne Nkechi Kafor

Defendant Attorney

Ranald Scott Calili

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Received by Court; Comments: fax/e-mail received by the court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketOrder of Withdrawal of Counsel; Comments: Order Permitting Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder of Withdrawal of Counsel; Comments: Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketMotion for Withdrawal of Counsel; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Sent by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing on Motion to Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Case set for hrg on mtn/withdrawal; no parties appeared.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $330.00, Payments: $330.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($16.00); Payor: Oyebisi, Thomas A.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-09092-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $330.00, Payments: $330.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $16.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Amended Petition and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $330.00, Payments: $330.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($314.00); Payor: Oyebisi, Thomas A.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-07916-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $330.00, Payments: $330.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less