Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/28/2019 at 16:12:57 (UTC).

The Woodlands Of Plano Apartments vs. Diamond Rayburn

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 The Woodlands Of Plano Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Diamond Rayburn. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0342

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Woodlands Of Plano Apartments

1370 S. Rigsbee Drive

Plano, TX 75074

Defendant

Rayburn, Diamond Leandrea

Plano, TX 75074

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Mailed Signed Judgment to Both Sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Dismissal Order Signed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Eviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: The Woodlands Of Plano Apartments; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001737-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Rayburn, Diamond Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 3-2; Paper No: C3-19-004141; Location: PCT 3 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Woodlands Of Plano Apartments is a litigant