This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/17/2021 at 22:18:19 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Donihoo Farms, Ltd., a Texas Limited Partnership, et. al.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 The State of Texas filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Donihoo Farms, Ltd , a Texas Limited Partnership. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Mason, Corinne A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Mason, Corinne A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The State of Texas

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Defendants

Simmons Bank, an Arkansas State Financial Institution

C/O Vernon Bryant, Registered Agent, 2200 West 7Th Street, Suite 112

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Donihoo Farms, Ltd., a Texas Limited Partnership

C/O Stephen L. Sallman, Registered Agent, 4925 Greenville Avenue, Suite 1020

Dallas, TX 75206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle Counce

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Setting Hearing for Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $110.00, Payments: $110.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($110.00); Payor: The State of Texas; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CV-04023-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $110.00, Payments: $110.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $110.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProject; Comments: CSJ: 2056-01-043; Parcel: 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPetition for Condemnation State (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Counce, Kyle Pierce