This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 09/23/2020 at 01:08:15 (UTC).

The State of Texas v. Remy Martin Hill, Defendant/Principal and Lexington National Ins. Corp., Defendant/Surety

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Remy Martin Hill, Defendant/Principal and Lexington National Ins Corp , Defendant/Surety. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Benjamin N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Benjamin N.

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Hill, Remy Martin (j)

Lexington National Insurance Corporation

12655 N. Central Expressway, Suite 315

Dallas, TX 75243

Hill, Remy Martin

Dallas, TX 75217

Not Classified By Court

The State Of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Lexington National Insurance Corporation

12655 N. Central Expressway, Suite 315

Dallas, TX 75243

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Defendant Attorneys

Steven S Bell

Debbie F Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $347.10, Payments: $347.10, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($41.10); Payor: Ranger Bail Bonds; Receipt: Receipt # DC-19224-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: Sent Receipt to DA NISI and Criminal Supervisor Queue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $347.10, Payments: $347.10, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $41.10; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $347.10, Payments: $347.10, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Ranger Bial Bonds; Receipt: Receipt # DC-10536-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: 4-17-2019 order of dismissal is VACATED. BNS-380

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: to DA NISI and Criminal Supervisor, Bill of Cost to Criminal Supervisor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment Letter Mailed; Comments: and Bill of cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment Letter and Bill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketBill of Cost - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: Sent Receipt to DA Nisi and Criminal Supervisor Queue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant - Surety Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $347.10, Payments: $347.10, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less