This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/20/2020 at 02:43:37 (UTC).

The State of Texas v. Miguel Mendoza, Defendant/Principal, Bankers Insurance Company, Defendant/Surety

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Miguel Mendoza, Defendant/Principal, Bankers Insurance Company, Defendant/Surety. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rusch, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rusch, Mark

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Bankers Insurance Company

The Good Law Firm, Law Office Of Ken W. Good, Pllc, 5604 Old Bullard Rd., Suite 102

Tyler, TX 75703

Mendoza, Miguel

Melissa, TX 75454

Mendoza, Miguel (j)

Not Classified By Court

The State Of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Bankers Insurance Company

The Good Law Firm, Law Office Of Ken W. Good, Pllc, 5604 Old Bullard Rd., Suite 102

Tyler, TX 75703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Defendant Attorneys

Ken W Good

Debbie F Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $569.01, Payments: $569.01, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($569.01); Payor: Saenz Industries INC DBA AA Best Bail Bonds; Receipt: Receipt # DC-16124-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: Sent Receipt to DA NISI and Criminal Supervisor Queue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $569.01, Payments: $569.01, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $263.01; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: Sent to Criminal Supervisor and DA NISI Queues and Calendared for 30 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: To Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment Letter Mailed; Comments: To Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketBill of Cost - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI Interest $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Judgment Nisi - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment Nisi - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $569.01, Payments: $569.01, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less