This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:28:55 (UTC).

The State of Texas v. Christopher Raymonne Perkins, Defendant/Principal and Bankers Insurance Company, Defendant/Surety

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Christopher Raymonne Perkins, Defendant/Principal and Bankers Insurance Company, Defendant/Surety. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Wheless, Ray and Nowak, Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Wheless, Ray

Nowak, Tom

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Perkins, Christopher Raymonne

Farmersville, TX 75442

Bankers Insurance Company

The Good Law Firm, Law Office Of Ken W. Good, Pllc, 5604 Old Bullard Rd., Suite 102

Tyler, TX 75703

Not Classified By Court

The State Of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Bankers Insurance Company

The Good Law Firm, Law Office Of Ken W. Good, Pllc, 5604 Old Bullard Rd., Suite 102

Tyler, TX 75703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Defendant Attorneys

Ken W Good

Debbie F Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1,806.00, Payments: $1,806.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($1,806.00); Payor: AA Best Bail Bonds; Receipt: Receipt # DC-06218-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: Receipt submitted to DA NISI Queue and Criminal Supervisor Queue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOrder Denied; Comments: Order Denying New Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMotion New Trial; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1,806.00, Payments: $1,806.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($80.00); Payor: Bankers Insurance Company; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02431-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1,806.00, Payments: $1,806.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $80.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Notice of Motion For New Trial Hearing in Aux Court C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMotion - New Trial - Civil $80.00; Comments: Defendant-Surety's Motion For New Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Judgment Nisi - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1,806.00, Payments: $1,806.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1,500.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketPass Slip and Notice to Appear; Comments: Pass Slip and Notice of Bond Forfeiture Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Notice of TBC in Aux Court C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1,806.00, Payments: $1,806.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less