This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 11/09/2020 at 08:29:01 (UTC).

The State of Texas v. Amy Christine Davis, Defendant/Principal, Accredited Surety & Cas. Co., Inc., Defendant/Surety

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Amy Christine Davis, Defendant/Principal, Accredited Surety Cas Co , Inc , Defendant/Surety. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Accredited Surety & Casualty Company, Inc.

12655 N. Central Expressway, Suite 315

Dallas, TX 75243

Davis, Amy Christine

Waxahachie, TX 75165

The State Of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Steven S Bell

Debbie F Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1,806.00, Payments: $1,806.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($1,806.00); Payor: AAA Bail Bonds; Receipt: Receipt # DC-07983-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: Receipt Sent to DA NISI and Criminal Supervisor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable; Comments: Amy Christine Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Judgment Nisi - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1,806.00, Payments: $1,806.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1,500.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment Letters and Bill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment Nisi - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketBill of Cost - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketJudgment NISI Bond$

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Scheduled Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable; Comments: Amy Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable; Comments: Amy Christine Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant-Surety' Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1,806.00, Payments: $1,806.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less