This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 08:57:46 (UTC).

The State of Texas, Plaintiff vs. Raynisecia Tana McCuin, Defendant/Principal American Surety Company, Defendant/Surety

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 The State of Texas, Plaintiff filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Raynisecia Tana McCuin, Defendant/Principal American Surety Company, Defendant/Surety. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

American Surety Company

By Serving Through Its Registered Agent:, Roger D. Moore, P.O. Box 92725

Southlake, TX 76092

McCuin, Raynisecia Tana

Fort Worth, TX 76105

Not Classified By Court

The State Of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

American Surety Company

By Serving Through Its Registered Agent:, Roger D. Moore, P.O. Box 92725

Southlake, TX 76092

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Defendant Attorneys

Vickers L Cunningham, Sr.

Debbie F Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPass Slip and Notice to Appear; Comments: Pass Slip and Notice of Bond Forfeiture Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPass Slip and Notice to Appear; Comments: Pass Slip and Notice of Bond Forfeiture Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Original Answer and General Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$311.00; Transactions: Amount: $311.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vickers L Cunningham, Sr.