This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 10/07/2020 at 05:30:15 (UTC).

The State of Texas, Plaintiff vs. Ranson Jase Sweet, Defendant/Principal Glynn L. Franklin, Defendant/Surety

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 The State of Texas, Plaintiff filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Ranson Jase Sweet, Defendant/Principal Glynn L Franklin, Defendant/Surety. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Wheless, Ray and Nowak, Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Wheless, Ray

Nowak, Tom

 

Party Details

Defendants

Sweet, Ranson Jase

Brownwood, TX 76801

Franklin, Glynn L.

Brownwood, TX 76801

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

The State Of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Franklin, Glynn L.

Brownwood, TX 76801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Debbie F Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $85.00; Description: Collin County Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $85.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketOut of County Service Fee $$; Comments: Glynn L. Franklin - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $319.00; Description: Collin County Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: To All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Motion to Dismiss Judgment of Forfeiture and Reinstate Bond Without Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $319.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Request for citation to registered agent, by personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Citation for Defendant/Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Judgment of Forfeiture-Individual Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet; Comments: Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debbie F Harrison