This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/24/2020 at 00:47:57 (UTC).

The State of Texas, Plaintiff vs. James Keith Rockwell, Defendant/Principal Bankers Insurance Company, Defendant/Surety

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 The State of Texas, Plaintiff filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against James Keith Rockwell, Defendant/Principal Bankers Insurance Company, Defendant/Surety. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Wheless, Ray and Nowak, Tom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Wheless, Ray

Nowak, Tom

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Rockwell, James Keith

Longview, TX 75604

Bankers Insurance Company

By Serving Its Registered Agent,, Randy Adler, 7027 Mumford Street

Dallas, TX 75252-6135

Not Classified By Court

The State Of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Bankers Insurance Company

By Serving Its Registered Agent,, Randy Adler, 7027 Mumford Street

Dallas, TX 75252-6135

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Defendant Attorneys

Randy Adler

Debbie F Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of TBC in Aux Court C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Granted; Comments: Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant-Surety's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Motion to Strike Hearing in Aux Court C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMotion; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$311.00; Transactions: Amount: $311.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet; Comments: Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bankers Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randy Adler