This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/16/2021 at 19:19:20 (UTC).

The State of Texas, Plaintiff vs. George Ibanez, Defendant/Principal Sun Surety Insurance Company, Defendant/Surety

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 The State of Texas, Plaintiff filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against George Ibanez, Defendant/Principal Sun Surety Insurance Company, Defendant/Surety. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Wheless, Ray and Nowak, Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Wheless, Ray

Nowak, Tom

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Sun Surety Insurance Company

Through Its Registered Agent, National Registered Agents, Inc, 1021 Main Street, Suite 1150A

Houston, TX 77002

Ibanez, George

Princeton, TX 75407

The State Of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Debbie F Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Judgment Nisi - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $5,477.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$5,477.00; Transactions: Amount: $5,000.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: Sent documents to Criminal Supervisor and DA Nisi Queue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment Letter Mailed; Comments: and Bill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketBill of Cost - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketJudgment NISI Bond$

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment Nisi - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketService Member & Sailor's Affidavit; Comments: Service Members Civil Relief Act Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation by Certified Mail $83.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketOut of County Service Fee $$; Comments: Sun Surety Insurance Company - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $5,477.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$5,477.00; Transactions: Amount: $319.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Request for Citation to Registered Agent for Defendant/Surety by Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Citation Request for Defendant/Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketJudgment NISI (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sun Surety Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debbie F Harrison