This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/17/2020 at 00:46:38 (UTC).

Teresa Kym Alvarado A/K/A Kym Wall Plaintiff vs. Shan Johnson, Shan Pools, Inc., Premier Pool & Spas Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Teresa Kym Alvarado A/K/A Kym Wall Plaintiff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shan Johnson, Shan Pools, Inc , Premier Pool Spas Defendant. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Willis, Jill. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Willis, Jill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvarado, Teresa Kym

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendants

Shan Pools, Inc.

5918 W. Courtyard Drive, Suite 500

Austin, TX 78730

Johnson, Shan

Austin, TX 78730

Premier Pool & Spas

Anderson & Eaves, L.L.P., 164 Sendero Verde

San Antonio, TX 78261

Ward, James

Austin, TX 78730

Porter, Paul

Granite Bay, CA 95746

Ribnikar, Michael

San Antonio, TX 78261

Premier Pools Management Company, Inc.

5748 Avenida Robles

Granite Bay, CA 95746

Baerwaldt, Aaron

Austin, TX 78730

Premier Pools & Spas, L.P.

5748 Avenida Robles

Granite Bay, CA 95746

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kari Bohach

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S Truesdale

Shaun C Eaves

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOrder on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Notice; Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketAgreement; Comments: Settlement and Release Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:25 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable; Comments: Shan Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset; Comments: 2.5 hours/side

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketSubpoena Return - Not DC Issued; Comments: Return of Service - Shan Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Shan Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Premier Pool & Spas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Shan Pools, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $402.00, Payments: $402.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($322.00); Payor: Alvarado, Teresa Kym; Receipt: Receipt # DC-06936-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $402.00, Payments: $402.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $322.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less