This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 00:02:19 (UTC).

TD Childcare, LLC , dba Montessori Academy at West vs. Erica Scott,Willie Scott

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 TD Childcare, LLC , dba Montessori Academy at West filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Erica Scott,Willie Scott. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0144

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Childcare, LLC , dba Montessori Academy at West

3103 Lincolnshire Dr

Richardson, TX 75082

Defendants

Scott, Erica

Frisco, TX 75035

Scott, Willie

Frisco, TX 75035

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketLetter From:; Comments: Plt - Requesting mail be sent to different address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff; Comments: Erica Scott failed to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff; Comments: Willie Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketTrial by Judge; Time: 11:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Trial to All Parties; Comments: trial 8/21 @11am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comments: Willie Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $196.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: TD Childcare, LLC , dba Montessori Academy at West; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-003014-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $196.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less