This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 10/08/2020 at 04:33:42 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs. ALEXANDER FAULCONER

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEXANDER FAULCONER. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0462

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

275 W Campbell, Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

FAULCONER, ALEXANDER

Plano, TX 75025-8221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John G.h. Davis

Robert E Jenkins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketOath of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Post-Judgment Receiver; Comments: Amended order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Amended Order appointing post-judgment receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Request; Comments: Request for signed copy of order granting receivership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Post-Judgment Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMotion to Appoint Post-Judgment Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Motion Hearing; Time: 11:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $3,062.38;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketExhibit; Comments: file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: TD Bank USA, N.A.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02166-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less