Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 02/14/2021 at 12:03:57 (UTC).

Sufyan Alotean vs. First Texas Homes

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Sufyan Alotean filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against First Texas Homes. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0050

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alotean, Sufyan

Frisco, TX 75035

Defendant

First Texas Homes

500 Crescent Court, #350

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

John D Sloan Jr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Time: 1:15 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: For hearing on 11/09/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Alotean, Sufyan; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-01675-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: small claim of damage against First Texas Homes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Texas Homes is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Sloan Jr