Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/16/2021 at 07:21:02 (UTC).

Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., Prime Mortgage Trust Certificates Series 2005-5, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee vs. Ohio Gravy Biscuit, Inc., and Ohio Corporation, as Trustee for the 9700 Honeysuckle Land Trust, et al.,

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc , Prime Mortgage Trust Certificates Series 2005-5, U S Bank National Association, as Trustee filed an Other lawsuit against Ohio Gravy Biscuit, Inc , and Ohio Corporation, as Trustee for the 9700 Honeysuckle Land Trust, . This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., Prime Mortgage Trust Certificates Series 2005-5

Bonial And Associates, P.C., 14841 Dallas Parkway Suite 425

Dallas, TX 75254

Defendants

9700HONEYSUCKLEDRIVE, LLC

Manager: Theodore Blanchard, 5042 Wilshire Blvd. #32102

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Mimas Holdings, LLC

Manager: Theodore Blanchard, 5042 Wilshire Blvd. #32102

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Pollard, Charles

Frisco, TX 75035

Ohio Gravy Biscuit, Inc

Registered Agent: Kenneth Harter, 5001 Spring Valley Rd., Ste. 400 E

Dallas, TX 75244

Pollard, Dena

Frisco, TX 75035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Burns

Defendant Attorneys

Mary H Barkley

Kenneth S Harter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketConference with Judge; Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Sent by Court; Comments: Scheduling Conference 01/15/2021 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Service-Mimas Holdings LLC-Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Service-9700Honeysuckledrive LLC-Served

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketExhibit; Comments: Petitioner's Exhibit No. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: First Amended Petition for Bill of Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $333.00, Payments: $333.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($333.00); Payor: u. s. bank, na as trustee; Receipt: Receipt # DC-17674-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $333.00, Payments: $333.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $333.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCitation; Comments: issued date modified to reflect re-issuance per Attorney's request to backdate PoP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketExhibit; Comments: Exhibit Nos. P-1 to P-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketBill of Review (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Petition for Bill of Review

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Gravy Biscuit, Inc., as Trustee for The Woodhaven Drive 1401 Land Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary H. Barkley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth S Harter