This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/24/2020 at 00:37:39 (UTC).

Stonewater Roofing, Ltd. VS. Issa Panahi

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 Stonewater Roofing, Ltd filed an Other lawsuit against Issa Panahi. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rippel, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rippel, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stonewater Roofing, Ltd.

102 North College, Suite 1033

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant

Panahi, Issa

Dallas, TX 75230

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason D. Mazingo

Defendant Attorney

Jeffery Veteto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCourt Administrator's Comments; Comments: Notice of Trial Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($317.00); Payor: Mazingo, Jason D.; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CV-06296-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketTransfer of Venue Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $20.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $297.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: on Def's Special Appearance and M/Trsf Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Deft's Special Appearance, Motion to Transfer Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: Citation Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPetition; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate; Comments: Certification of Civil Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketOrder; Comments: Agreed Order Transferring Case signed 10/3/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPetition for Transfer/Out of County(OCA); Comments: Transfer Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffery M. Veteto