This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 06/16/2020 at 00:29:00 (UTC).

Starwood vs. Amon Stevens

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Starwood filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Amon Stevens. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0622

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Starwood

8205 Towne Main Dr

Plano, TX 75024

Defendant

Stevens, Amon Christopher

Plano, TX 75024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Eviction Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: MAILED JUDGMENT TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketEviction Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: new court date to all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Granted; Comments: NEW CT DT MAY 9TH 2019 @ 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: 1 WK CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Starwood; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02760-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation; Comments: SENT TO CONST PCT 4 ON 4/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less