Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 14:03:16 (UTC).

Southern Steel Fabricators Plaintiff, v. Tom Wright Construction, LLC dba Built Wright Construction and Plain Old Texas, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Southern Steel Fabricators Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tom Wright Construction, LLC dba Built Wright Construction and Plain Old Texas, LLC. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern Steel Fabricators

Edinburg, TX 78539

Defendants

Tom Wright Construction, LLC

Through Its Registered Agent, Thomas Anthony Wright, 963 S. Loop 340

Waco, TX 76706

Plain Old Texas, LLC

Through Its Registered Agent, Timothy Carrol, 809 Shorecrest Drive

Southlake, TX 76092

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L. Flores

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: Order Granting Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketOrder on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Plain Old Texas, LLC - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Tom Wright Construction, LLC - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $324.00, Payments: $324.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($324.00); Payor: Southern Steel Fabricators; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00325-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $324.00, Payments: $324.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $324.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tom Wright Construction, LLC is a litigant