This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 09/07/2020 at 02:11:46 (UTC).

Siemens Industry, Inc., Plaintiff v. Lumin Health, LLC, a Texas Limited Liability Company; Star Medical Center, LLC, Also Known as Surgical Treatment and Recovery Medical Center, a Texas Limited Liability Company, Defendants

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Siemens Industry, Inc , Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lumin Health, LLC, a Texas Limited Liability Company Star Medical Center, LLC, Also Known as Surgical Treatment and Recovery Medical Center, a Texas Limited Liability Company, Defendants. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Willis, Jill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Willis, Jill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Siemens Industry, Inc.

Trachtman & Trachtman, Llp, 19732 Macarthur Boulevard, Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendants

Lumin Health, LLC

By Serving Through Its Registered Agent, Incorp Services, Inc, 815 Brazo Street, Suite 500

Austin, TX 78701

Star Medical Center, LLC

Murphy Rodriguez Pllc, 1011 N. Surrey Lane, Bldg. 200

Flower Mound, TX 75022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M Craig

Defendant Attorney

Ramon de Jesus Rodriguez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: 2.5 hours/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketDiscovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order; Comments: Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order (Level 1 or 2 - Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOrder for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: Agreed Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:25 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreed Discovery Control Plan/Scheduling Order Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDiscovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order; Comments: Discovery Control Plan & Scheduling Order (Level 1 or 2 - Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Substitute Counsel; Comments: Order Granting Defendant Star Medical Center, LLC's Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw; Comments: Defendant Star Medical Center, LLC's Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continuance Granted; Comments: 2 hours/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketOrder for Continuance; Comments: Order Granting Defendant Star Medical Center, LLC's Joint Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: Re: Star Medical Center, LLC - an entity served in Texas Cause No. 429-00789-2019 / Siemens Industry, Incl v. Lumin Health, LLC, et al. Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketOut of County Service Fee; Comments: Officer's Return - Incorp Services Inc Registered Agent for Lumin Health LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketOut of County Service Fee; Comments: Citation - Agent for Star Medical Center, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($314.00); Payor: Siemens Industry, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03904-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Original Petition of Siemens Industry, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less