Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 08/23/2020 at 01:21:23 (UTC).

Shauntra Maddison vs. Tom Ooi

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Shauntra Maddison filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Tom Ooi. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0395

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maddison, Shauntra

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

Ooi, Tom

Plano, TX 75024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Defendant - Plaintiff Take Nothing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Defendant - Plaintiff Take Nothing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketTrial by Judge; Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Trial to All Parties; Comments: 3/4 @10am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Maddison, Shauntra; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-007790-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $126.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less