This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 11/26/2019 at 14:16:54 (UTC).

Sharon Thorpe and Wesley Thorpe vs. Phillip Carter, North-Forty Development, LLC, Texas First Financial, LLC., Christian Custom Homes, LLC., Texas Cash Cow Investments, Inc.; Bobby Eugene Guess

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Sharon Thorpe and Wesley Thorpe filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Phillip Carter, North-Forty Development, LLC, Texas First Financial, LLC , Christian Custom Homes, LLC , Texas Cash Cow Investments, Inc Bobby Eugene Guess. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Edgeworth, Jennifer and Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Edgeworth, Jennifer

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thorpe, Wesley

Frisco, TX 75034

Thorpe, Sharon

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendants

Texas Cash Cow Investments, Inc.

Registered Agent: Phillip Carter, 2626 Twelve Oaks Lane

Celina, TX 75009

North Forty Development, LLC

Registered Agent, Capitol Corporate Services, Inc., 206 E. 9Th St., Ste. 1300

Austin, TX 78701-4411

Guess, Bobby Eugene

Mckinney, TX 75071

Texas First Financial, LLC.

By And Through Its Registered Agent, Bobby Guess, Collin County Jail, 4300 Community Avenue, 3C, Cell 36, Bunk 1

Mckinney, TX 75071

Provident Trust Group, LLC

Registered Agent: Ct Corporation System, 701 S Carson Street, Ste. 200

Carson City, NV 89701

Christian Custom Homes, LLC.

Registered Agent: Capital Corporate Service, 206 E. 9Th St., Ste. 1300

Austin, TX 78701-4411

Carter, Phillip

Frisco, TX 75033

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy N Soefje

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • Administrative Order; Comments: Order signed 9/30/2019 to transfer to the 471st.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Administrative Order; Comments: Administrative Order of Assignment - Transfer to 296th District Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Conference with Judge; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Transferred To Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Returned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Returned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Returned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Request for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Letter; Comments: Letter Requesting Citations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $303.00; Comments: Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $354.00, Payments: $354.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($354.00); Payor: Thorpe, Sharon; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02979-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $354.00, Payments: $354.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $354.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less