Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/04/2021 at 21:24:48 (UTC).

Sabrina D. Sanchez vs. Christopher G. Sanchez

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Sabrina D Sanchez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Christopher G Sanchez. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Respondent

Sanchez, Christopher G.

Allen, TX 75002

Applicant

Sanchez, Sabrina D.

Allen, TX 75013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Kenneth R. Moore

Applicant Attorney

J. Gregory Whitten, ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Case called. Parties appeared with counsel. W/S, E/P. PO denied. Permanent Injunction ordered and signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProtective Order Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Start @2:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProtective Order Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Extending; Comments: Agreed Order to Extended Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Order for Continuance of Protective Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProtective Order Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketConstable Service Return; Comments: Officer's Return Notice of Application for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketConstable Service Return; Comments: Officer's Return Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Respondent, Charges: $693.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$693.00; Transactions: Amount: $358.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketIssued Protective Order (Court Activity)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketTemporary Ex Parte Protective Order; Comments: Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Order Setting Hearing, Nunc Pro Tunc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketIssued Protective Order (Court Activity)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Ex Parte Protective Order $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketTemporary Ex Parte Protective Order; Comments: Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Order Setting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Ex parte protective order granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketApp for Protective Ord (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Application for Protective Order and Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth R. Moore