This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 09/27/2019 at 16:22:50 (UTC).

Ruth Gibbs vs. Marion Salazar,Hailey Ake

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Ruth Gibbs filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Marion Salazar,Hailey Ake. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0086

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gibbs, Ruth D

Princeton, TX 75407

Defendants

Ake, Hailey

Princeton, TX 75407

Salazar, Marion

Wylie, TX 75098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • Dismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Mail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 11/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Citation Served; Comments: Marion Salazar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Citation Served; Comments: Hailey Ake

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Small Claims Petition; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($201.00); Payor: Gibbs, Ruth D; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02473-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $201.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $5,030.00;

    Read MoreRead Less