This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/01/2020 at 00:22:15 (UTC).

Rudolph Rivas vs. Albert Lavalais, IV

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Rudolph Rivas filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Albert Lavalais, IV. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0119

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rivas, Rudolph Edward

Fairiview, TX 75069

Defendant

Lavalais, Albert Earl "Rocky", IV

7300 Dallas Parkway

Plano, TX 75024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

James C Mosser

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Judgment to Both Sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Judgment to Both Sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketDocket Sign-In Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketFailed to Appear Certificate Signed; Comments: RUDOLPH RIVAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotes per Judge; Comments: ORDER ON DEFENDANTSMOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO TEX. R. CIV. P. 91a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Filed with answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCIVIL Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Rivas, Rudolph Edward; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0002602-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $126.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less