This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 10/06/2020 at 15:16:41 (UTC).

RJR Realty, LLC vs. Collin Central Appraisal District

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 RJR Realty, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Collin Central Appraisal District. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Benjamin N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Benjamin N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RJR Realty, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4610

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

Collin Central Appraisal District

Mckinney, TX 75069-8023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Niral R. Gandhi

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer T Pettit

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($316.00); Payor: RJR Realty, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-20554-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $316.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Clerk Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order

    Read MoreRead Less