Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/31/2019 at 16:11:14 (UTC).

Reserve at Stonebridge Ranch vs. Jessica Hale

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 Reserve at Stonebridge Ranch filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jessica Hale. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0759

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reserve at Stonebridge Ranch

2305 S Custer Rd

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

Hale, Jessica

Mckinney, TX 75070

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Motion for Dismissal; Comments: EMAILED/FAXED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Rule 510.4c Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Request Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Eviction Citation; Comments: SENT TO CONST PCT 4 THRU QUEUE - JB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Reserve at Stonebridge Ranch; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03362-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Hale, Jessica Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 4; Paper No: C4-19-002106; Location: PCT 4 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESERVE AT STONEBRIDGE RANCH is a litigant