This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/19/2019 at 15:46:46 (UTC).

Regions Bank vs. QWETU, Inc., Edward M. Kiiru, and Josephine N. Mwai, Regions Bank vs. J.P. Morgan Chase, National Association

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Regions Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QWETU, Inc , Edward M Kiiru, and Josephine N Mwai, Regions Bank. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rusch, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rusch, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regions Bank

Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, 1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 3700

Houston, TX 77010

Defendants

Kiiru, Edward

Wylie, TX 75098-7972

Mwai, Josephine N.

Wylie, TX 75098

QWETU, Inc

By Serving Its Registered Agent, Edward M. Kiiru, 1512 Quail Meadow Drive

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa G. Vest

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: To Attorneys and Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Mailed; Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Service Return; Comments: Amended Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Service Return; Comments: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Request for Writ of Garnishment $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $303.00; Comments: Application for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Regions Bank; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02456-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less