This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 07/23/2020 at 00:47:12 (UTC).

Reginald Sampson, as Agent and Attorney-in-Fact for Lillie Ruth Harris vs. U.S. Bank National Association, as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust and Fay Servicing, LLC as Mortgage Servicer

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Reginald Sampson, as Agent and Attorney-in-Fact for Lillie Ruth Harris filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against U S Bank National Association, as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust and Fay Servicing, LLC as Mortgage Servicer. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rusch, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rusch, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Harris, Lillie Ruth

Dallas, TX 75240

Sampson, Reginald

Dallas, TX 75240

Defendants

Fay Servicing, LLC

By Serving Its Registered Agent:, Registered Agent Solutions, Inc., 1701 Directors Blvd., Suite 300

Austin, TX 78744

U.S. Bank National Association

Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C., 14160 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Helstowski

Defendant Attorney

Mark D Cronenwett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $32.00, Payments: $32.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($25.00); Payor: Collin County District Clerk; Receipt: Receipt # DC-11954-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $32.00, Payments: $32.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $25.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Release Cash Bond; Comments: Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Release Cash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to Release Cash Bond; Comments: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Release Cash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketTemporary Injunction; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Removed To Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketTemporary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $32.00, Payments: $32.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($32.00); Payor: Harris, Lillie Ruth; Receipt: Receipt # DC-09305-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $32.00, Payments: $32.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($5.00); Payor: Helstowski, John; Receipt: Receipt # DC-08935-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $32.00, Payments: $32.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $4.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $32.00, Payments: $32.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $32.00, Payments: $32.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($298.00); Payor: Sampson, Reginald; Receipt: Receipt # DC-08931-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $32.00, Payments: $32.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $298.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Cash Deposit in Lieu of Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketBond Application Fee Collected $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: tro signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Verified Petition

    Read MoreRead Less