This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 12/06/2020 at 02:08:59 (UTC).

Rapid Masonry Supply, Inc. vs. Jose Resendiz

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Rapid Masonry Supply, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jose Resendiz. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0137

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rapid Masonry Supply, Inc.

12222 Merit Drive, Suite 340

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant

Resendiz, Jose Pedro

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan White

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Time: 2:00 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for 07/06/20 hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Default Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: proposed Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: military affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: certificate of last know address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Amended Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketHearing Rescheduled per Supreme Court Order 20-9042; Comments: by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Jose Resendiz return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $5,087.74;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketMailed Citations; Comments: back to attorney for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Rapid Masonry Supply, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03458-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan White