Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 06/06/2020 at 00:03:53 (UTC).

Rajeev Jha vs. Takisha Martin-Smith,Franche Smith

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Rajeev Jha filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Takisha Martin-Smith,Franche Smith. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0748

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jha, Rajeev Kumar

Frisco, TX 75035

Defendants

Smith, Franche

Mckinney, TX 75072

Martin-Smith, Takisha

Mckinney, TX 75072

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: Jha, Rajeev Kumar; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-04101-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Comments: SENT TO CONST PCT 4 THRU QUEUE - JB // Verified rec'd 5.31.19 @ 2:15P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Eviction Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: JUDGMENT TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed; Comments: BOTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: Jha, Rajeev Kumar; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03225-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $381.00, Payments: $381.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $196.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation; Comments: SENT TO CONST PCT 4 THRU QUEUE - JB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less