This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/19/2020 at 14:09:53 (UTC).

RAFAEL JURADO, Jr. vs. Jorge Parra

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 RAFAEL JURADO, Jr filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jorge Parra. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0081

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JURADO, RAFAEL, Jr.

9473 Olive St

Princeton, TX 75407

Defendant

Parra, Jorge

Lavon, TX 75166

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Jury Trial - Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketJury Trial; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for jury trial on 11/11/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketJury Panel Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $148.00, Payments: $148.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($22.00); Payor: JURADO, RAFAEL, Jr.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02640-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $148.00, Payments: $148.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $22.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketJury Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $148.00, Payments: $148.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: JURADO, RAFAEL, Jr.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02443-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $148.00, Payments: $148.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $148.00, Payments: $148.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less