This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 09:58:52 (UTC).

Qaisar Khan vs. Esthela C. Granados Flores, Bryan Jose Meraz

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Qaisar Khan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Esthela C Granados Flores, Bryan Jose Meraz. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Khan, Qaisar

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

Granados Flores, Esthela C.

Mckinney, TX 75069

Meraz, Bryan Jose

Princeton, TX 75407

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda M. Green

Andrew Vrankovic

Dana G Kirk

Defendant Attorney

John W Stilwell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPre Trial; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order; Comments: Jury Trial Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPre Trial; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Comments: Notice of Appearance of Lead Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition(Bill of Cost Form); Comments: Certification Rule 203 Filing - Records From: Geico County Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition(Bill of Cost Form); Comments: Certification Rule 203 Filing - Records from: Geico County Mutual Insurance Company Claim #0551229330101104 - Insurance Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition(Bill of Cost Form); Comments: Certification Rule 203 Filing - Records from: Geico County Mutual Insurance Company Claim # 0551229330101021 - Insurance Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions; Comments: Notice of Intention To Take Deposition By Written Questions

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($40.00); Payor: Granados Flores, Esthela C.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-07757-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $40.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketJury Fee Paid $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Original Answer of Defendant Esthela C. Granados Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Esthela C. Granados Flores-Citation-Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($324.00); Payor: Khan, Qaisar; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04492-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $324.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition and First Set of Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W Stilwell