This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 10/24/2019 at 16:17:28 (UTC).

Property Frameworks DFW, as Agent for ASGE Properties LLC c/o Michael Korenvayn vs. Norman Hunt,Megan Hunt and All Other Occupants

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Property Frameworks DFW, as Agent for ASGE Properties LLC c/o Michael Korenvayn filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Norman Hunt,Megan Hunt and All Other Occupants. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0351

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Property Frameworks DFW, as Agent for ASGE Properties LLC c/o Michael Korenvayn

C/O Nationwide Eviction, 6300 Lc Calma Dr. Suite 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

Megan Hunt and All Other Occupants

Wylie, TX 75098

Hunt, Norman

Wylie, TX 75098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Eviction Citation Served; Comments: both parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Notice of Hearing; Comments: emailed to filer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: Property Frameworks DFW, as Agent for ASGE Properties LLC c/o Michael Korenvayn; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03341-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Past Due Rent; Remedy Amount: $2,030.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Hunt, Norman Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 2; Paper No: C2-19-002223; Location: PCT 2 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Hunt, Megan Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 2; Paper No: C2-19-002224; Location: PCT 2 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Property Frameworks DFW, as agent for D and S Realty Investments Ltd is a litigant