This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 10/02/2020 at 00:51:32 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. ERYAN ROMERO

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERYAN ROMERO. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0497

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

15660 Dallas, Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

ROMERO, ERYAN J

Dallas, TX 75287

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse Dow Lockhart

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketBench Note; Comments: signed agreement at bench

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketMediation Hearing; Time: 1:00 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMediation Notice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketTo be set for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: PS $82.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $2,963.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed; Comments: file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02381-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less