This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 01/28/2020 at 04:12:54 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. ERIC STARK

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERIC STARK. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0530

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

15660 Dallas, Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

STARK, ERIC E

Mckinney, TX 75070

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Rhodell Stottlemyre

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit; Comments: Notice Of non suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: 5/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: EMAILED TO rsiehcourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02130-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $46.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less