This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 09/29/2019 at 14:45:07 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. DEANNA GARLAND

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEANNA GARLAND. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0061

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Rausch Sturm, 15660 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

GARLAND, DEANNA

Dallas, TX 75287

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Rhodell Stottlemyre

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • Plaintiff's Request; Comments: E-filed request for a copy of the Default Judgment // emailed copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Mailed; Comments: ORDER TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Dismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to be Forthcoming

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DWOP Hearing; Comments: 5.3.19 @ 10am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Return of Service Filed; Comments: SERVED 1.16.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Debt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: EMAILED - RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Debt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-00172-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $5,342.96;

    Read MoreRead Less