This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/30/2020 at 00:05:26 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. BRODY VEAL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRODY VEAL. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0272

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

15660 Dallas, Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

VEAL, BRODY

Princeton, TX 75407

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megan Hale

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketDefendant Failed to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Order Granting for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 070819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: 04/04/19 Returned to court04/17/19 Answer dateService fee $82.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $2,867.26;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment; Comments: Efiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation; Comments: Emailed to ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-01145-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less