This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 04/04/2021 at 00:43:50 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Fifth Third Bank / Fifth Third Bank vs. Zahra Jafri

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Fifth Third Bank / Fifth Third Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Zahra Jafri. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1651

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Fifth Third Bank / Fifth Third Bank

3880 Seattle Slew Drive

Celina, TX 75009

Defendant

Jafri, Zahra

Plano, TX 75024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer P Sanders

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment; Comments: MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($5.00); Payor: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Fifth Third Bank / Fifth Third Bank; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-02262-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $5.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Requested and Paid For

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($5.00); Payor: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Fifth Third Bank / Fifth Third Bank; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-01543-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $5.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCopies Requested; Comments: Copy of Judgment, emailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: 2/7/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: emailed 8/26/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Fifth Third Bank / Fifth Third Bank; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-06511-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer P Sanders