This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 02/04/2021 at 14:02:33 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Capital One Bank (usa), N.a. / Capital One Bank (usa), N.a. vs. Ashley Hallliburton

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Capital One Bank usa , N a / Capital One Bank usa , N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ashley Hallliburton. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1657

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Capital One Bank (usa), N.a. / Capital One Bank (usa), N.a.

3880 Seattle Slew Drive

Celina, TX 75009

Defendant

Hallliburton, Ashley R

Plano, TX 75024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer P Sanders

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($5.00); Payor: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Capital One Bank (usa), N.a. / Capital One Bank (usa), N.a.; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-06433-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $5.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Requested and Paid For

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($5.00); Payor: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Capital One Bank (usa), N.a. / Capital One Bank (usa), N.a.; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-03226-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $5.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Request; Comments: for copy of judgment/emailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to be Forthcoming

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: 2/7/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: emailed 8/26/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Capital One Bank (usa), N.a. / Capital One Bank (usa), N.a.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-06518-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $61.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer P Sanders