Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/13/2020 at 15:13:51 (UTC).

Plano Summit Investment Venture, LP vs. Michael Pace

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Plano Summit Investment Venture, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Michael Pace. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0339

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plano Summit Investment Venture, LP

P.O. Box 260039

Plano, TX 75026

Defendant

Pace, Michael

Wylie, TX 75098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $231.00, Payments: $231.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $175.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $231.00, Payments: $231.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketEviction Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Filed with The Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Eviction Default - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketFailed to Appear Certificate Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Judgment to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $4,410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $231.00, Payments: $231.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: Plano Summit Investment Venture, LP; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001673-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $231.00, Payments: $231.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Eviction (Forcible Detainer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA); Comments: back page not needed. Case is in county.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less