This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 11/12/2020 at 13:44:23 (UTC).

PLANO ISD/CITY OF PLANO/CC-CCCCD Vs. STATE BANK OF TEXAS

Case Summary

On 03/14/2006 PLANO ISD/CITY OF PLANO/CC-CCCCD filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against STATE BANK OF TEXAS. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Oldner, Chris. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6406

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Oldner, Chris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Plano City Of

Mckinney, TX 75070

Cc/ccccd, .

Abernathy Roeder Boyd Hullett, 1700 N.Redbud Blvd.. #300

Mckinney, TX 75070

Plano Isd .

Abernathy Roeder Boyd Hullett, 1700 N.Redbud Blvd.. #300

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

State Bank Texas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David B. McCall, III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: DOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $226.00, Payments: $226.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($50.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVAGG211619; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $226.00, Payments: $226.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($176.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVAGG211618; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: ORDER/DISMISSSGND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX CIT CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX CIT CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: UNABLE TO FWD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: LTR-STATE BANK OF TEXAS/RETURNED-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $226.00, Payments: $226.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $176.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: REQ FOR TAX CIT BY MAIL/NO MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: P'S 1ST AMENDED ORIG PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: UNEXECUTED/UNABLE TO FWD/3-23-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: CIT-STATE BANK-TEXAS/RETURNED/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $226.00, Payments: $226.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $50.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: ISS CIT BY CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: REQ FOR TAX CIT BY MAIL/NO MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: TAX SUITS/NO MONEY RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE BANK OF TEXAS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. McCall, III