This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 01/16/2021 at 01:32:13 (UTC).

Plano Independent School District, Collin County, Collin County CCD vs. David Paul Welsh, Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 Plano Independent School District, Collin County, Collin County CCD filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against David Paul Welsh. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Collin County

Mckinney, TX 75069

Collin County CCD

Mckinney, TX 75069

Plano Independent School District

Abernathy Roeder Boyd Hullett, 1700 N.Redbud Blvd.,#300

Mckinney, TX 75069

Defendants

Welsh, David Paul

Richardson, TX 75080

Welsh, Pamela H

Richardson, TX 75080

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad D Timmons

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketConstable Service Return; Comments: Unserved-Pamela H Welsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Counsel for petitioner appeared, no Motion to Reinstate on file. -AST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMotion to Reinstate; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Notice of Hearing to: David Paul Welsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence Received by Court; Comments: fax/e-mail received by the court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Case called, no answer.DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. -AST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $554.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$554.00; Transactions: Amount: $83.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation by Certified Mail $83.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketConstable Service Return; Comments: Unserved-Pamela Welsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketConstable Service Return; Comments: David Paul Welsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $554.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$554.00; Transactions: Amount: $388.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketConstable Service Fee #3, $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketTax Original Petition - OCA $222.00; Comments: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less