This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/20/2019 at 12:32:06 (UTC).

Plano Independent School District, City of Plano, Collin County, Collin County CCD vs. Graham Mortgage Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/28/2015 Plano Independent School District, City of Plano, Collin County, Collin County CCD filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Graham Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in Collin County District Courthouse, Collin County District Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Oldner, Chris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2015

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Oldner, Chris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Plano

Collin County

Collin County CCD

Plano Independent School District

Defendants

West Plano Medical Center Condominium Owners Assoc Inc

Graham Mortgage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin Minett Hutto

Defendant Attorney

Alan S Leibel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketLetter; Comments: with payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketRequest for Citation by Certified Mail $83.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketTax Original Petition - OCA $222.00; Comments: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $383.00, Payments: $383.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($383.00); Payor: LegacyTexas Title 214-272-5400; Receipt: Receipt # DC-39308-2015; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $383.00, Payments: $383.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $383.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less